Edwards v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Ayanna Edwards
Defendant: Defendant Walmart Inc., Jane Doe and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01609
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #11 . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Motion to Remand to State Court #11 is taken under advisement as of 12/30/2020. The request for oral argument shall be considered in due course. (pjg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ayanna Edwards. (Kafoury, Gregory)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta - A Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Wednesday, December 2, 2020 at 10:30 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided by separate sealed entry. (pjg)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/26/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7241461. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to John Barhoum Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (nd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #1 (duplicate payments inadvertently made). Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Jessica Lancaster ISO Notice of Removal. Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C_Service Docs, #2 Exhibit D_RFP, #3 Exhibit E_NOD) (Lancaster, Jessica)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7241396.. NEF Regenerated. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Complaint, #2 Exhibit B_Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lancaster, Jessica) Modified to include payment information on 9/16/2020 . NEF Regenerated.(sss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayanna Edwards
Represented By: Mark Gillis McDougal
Represented By: Jason L. Kafoury
Represented By: Gregory Kafoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?