Chung v. 100.3 FM Business
Plaintiff: Andy Chung
Defendant: 100.3 FM Business
Case Number: 3:2020cv01633
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff Andy Chungs Application for Leave to Proceed IFP [ECF 3] is GRANTED but his Complaint [ECF 1] is DISMISSED with prejudice... Signed on 10/30/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/30/2020.) (kms)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pre-filing Review Order. Signed on 10/15/20 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/15/20.) (eo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Andy Chung. (joha)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/21/20.) (eo)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. No filing fee or IFP application presented. Filed by Andy Chung against 100.3 FM Business. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chung v. 100.3 FM Business
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100.3 FM Business
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?