First Interstate Bank v. SOSCO Aviation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank
Defendant: Harold Sosna, Premier Health Care Management, Inc. and SOSCO Aviation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01649
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 41 Proposed Form of Order Submitted Supplemental Judgment and Money Award. Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS as modified Plaintiff's Motion #37 for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs and AWARDS Plaintiff attorneys' fees of $78,515.55 and paralegal fees of $631.40. The Court also AWARDS Plaintiff costs of $2,455.80 as set out in Plaintiff's Bill of Costs #39 . Signed on 5/19/21 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 16 page Opinion and Order. (bb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 39 Bill of Costs . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce).
April 28, 2021 Filing 38 Declaration of Bruce H. Cahn . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees #37 .) (Cahn, Bruce)
April 28, 2021 Filing 37 Motion for Attorney Fees . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
April 14, 2021 Filing 36 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MONEY AWARD. Signed on 4/14/21 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 35 Proposed Form of Order Submitted . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs Motion #30 for Entry of Default and supporting documents. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion and enters an Order of Default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) against Defendants SOSCO Aviation, LLC, and Harold Sosna for failure to file an answer or other appearance in this matter within the time required by law. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiffs request for entry of Default Judgment against the Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b). The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to provide a proper form of judgment for signature by the Court. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks recovery of attorneys fees and costs, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a Bill of Costs and motion for attorneys fees with supporting materials within the time required by the Rules following entry of judgment. (bb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 33 Status Report by First Interstate Bank. Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
March 25, 2021 Filing 32 Declaration of Bruce H. Cahn . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Related document(s): Motion for default #30 .) (Cahn, Bruce)
March 25, 2021 Filing 31 Declaration of Cindy Crowther . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Related document(s): Motion for default #30 .) (Cahn, Bruce)
March 25, 2021 Filing 30 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant Sosco Aviations response to Complaint was due 2/18/21 and none has been received and Defendant Sosnas response to Complaint was due 3/17/21 and also no answer has been filed. Plaintiff is directed to file a Status Report no later than 3/29/21. (bb)
February 25, 2021 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed as to Harold Sosna served on 2/25/2020, answer due on 3/17/2020. (Cahn, Bruce)
February 4, 2021 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed as to SOSCO Aviation, LLC served on 1/28/2021, answer due on 2/18/2021. (Cahn, Bruce)
January 4, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Issued Electronically as to SOSCO Aviation, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
January 4, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Issued Electronically as to Harold Sosna. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
December 30, 2020 Filing 24 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
December 30, 2020 Filing 23 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
December 30, 2020 Filing 22 First Amended Complaint . Filed by First Interstate Bank against SOSCO Aviation, LLC, Harold Sosna. (Cahn, Bruce)
December 8, 2020 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service Return of Service Executed (Cahn, Bruce)
December 8, 2020 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to Harold Sosna served on 10/28/2020, answer due on 11/18/2020. (Cahn, Bruce)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 Limited Judgment of Dismissal without prejudice, costs or fees as to defendant Premier Health Care Management, Inc. ("Premier"). Signed on 11/17/20 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Form of Order Submitted Limited Judgment of Dismissal as to Premier Health Care. Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 Affidavit of Mailing Return of Service Executed as to Premier Health Care Management, Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due on 10/29/2020. (Cahn, Bruce)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to Premier Health Care Management, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due on 10/21/2020. (Cahn, Bruce) Modified to include party and service dates on 10/30/2020 (sss).
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 Affidavit of Mailing Return of Service Executed as to SOSCO Aviation, LLC served on 10/5/2020, answer due on 10/29/2020. (Cahn, Bruce)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to SOSCO Aviation, LLC served on 9/30/2020, answer due on 10/21/2020. (Cahn, Bruce) Modified to correct service date on 11/5/2020 (sss).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion #12 for Extension of Time [for Defendant Premier Health Care Management] to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant PremierHealth Care Managements response to Plaintiffs Complaint is now due no later than 11/18/20. (bb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [for Defendant Premier Health Care Management] to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce) Modified on 10/26/2020 (bb).
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to SOSCO Aviation, LLC served on 9/30/2020, answer due on 10/21/2020. (Cahn, Bruce)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Premier Health Care Management, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due on 10/21/2020. (Cahn, Bruce) Modified to correct service date . NEF Regenerated on 10/13/2020 (sss).
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Premier Health Care Management, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Premier Health Care Management, Inc. Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Premier Health Care Management, Inc., SOSCO Aviation, LLC, Harold Sosna. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re SOSCO Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by First Interstate Bank. (Cahn, Bruce)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7265606 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by First Interstate Bank against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Cahn, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Interstate Bank v. SOSCO Aviation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Interstate Bank
Represented By: Bruce H. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Sosna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Health Care Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOSCO Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?