Schumann v. Amazon.com Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Canan Schumann
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC and Amazon.com Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01751
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Amazon.com Services, LLC served on 10/23/2020 Filed by Canan Schumann. (Schuck, David)
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon Amazon.com Inc. served on 11/11/2020 Filed by Canan Schumann. (Schuck, David)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #17 as follows: Response to motion to dismiss/stay due by 12/14/2020. Reply to response to motion to dismiss/stay due by 1/11/2021. Order: Resetting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Stay #13 from 12/14/2020 to the under advisement calendar of 1/19/2021. (gm)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss or Stay Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #13 . Filed by Canan Schumann. (Schuck, David)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Stay #13 on the under advisement calendar of 12/14/2020. The request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Should the Court deem the motion appropriate for disposition with oral argument upon review of the briefings, the motion will be scheduled accordingly. (gm)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Blatt, Janine)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Jason Schwartz . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Blatt, Janine)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss or Stay Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com Inc.. (Blatt, Janine)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 as to Attorney Jason C. Schwartz. (gm)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 as to Attorney David A. Schnitzer. (gm)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 as to Attorney Lisa A. Bender. (gm)
November 13, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jason C. Schwartz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488233 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 13, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lisa A. Bender. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488168 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 13, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Schnitzer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488191 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jason C. Schwartz. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488233. Filed by All Defendants. (Schwartz, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David A. Schnitzer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488191. Filed by All Defendants. (Schnitzer, David)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lisa A. Bender. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7488168. Filed by All Defendants. (Bender, Lisa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Amazon.com Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons re Amazon.com Inc. Filed by Canan Schumann. (Brown, Stephanie)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons) (ecp)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/10/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7347078 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Canan Schumann against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Schuck, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schumann v. Amazon.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canan Schumann
Represented By: David Arthur Schuck
Represented By: Stephanie J. Brown
Represented By: Karen A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Bender
Represented By: David Schnitzer
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Represented By: Janine C. Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Bender
Represented By: David Schnitzer
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Represented By: Janine C. Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?