Placido v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Placido
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01904
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 83 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lenkowsky, Diane)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan F. Aylstock #79 , by Attorney Bobby J. Bradford #80 , and by Attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh #81 . (pjg)
December 15, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636861 #81 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 15, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bobby J. Bradford. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636770 #80 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 15, 2020 Filing 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Daniel J. Thornburgh. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636861. Filed by Tracy Placido. (Thornburgh, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Filing 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bobby J. Bradford. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636770. Filed by Tracy Placido. (Bradford, Jr., Bobby)
December 15, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bryan F. Aylstock. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636624 #79 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 15, 2020 Filing 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bryan F. Aylstock. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7636624. Filed by Tracy Placido. (Aylstock, Bryan)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #77 . The deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report is extended to 12/31/2020. (pjg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 77 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time Joint Status Report Deadline. Filed by All Defendants. (Loftis, Jeanne)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #75 filed by Attorney Anita Modak-Truran. (pjg)
November 19, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Anita Modak-Truran. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7511544 #75 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Anita Modak-Truran. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7511544. Filed by All Defendants. (Loftis, Jeanne)
November 18, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Jeanne F. Loftis is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney William M. Gage; Christy D. Jones; Susan M. Robinson; Kari L. Sutherland; David B. Thomas; Rebecca Lee Wiggs; Kasey Mitchell Adams and Kenneth Paul Conour Filed by All Defendants. (Loftis, Jeanne)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: The parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 12/1/2020. (pjg)
November 4, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Southern District of West Virginia. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #71 . (eo)
November 4, 2020 Filing 71 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-22170. Electronic file received.
October 23, 2020 Filing 70 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 2718-Order re Garely, #2 Exhibit ECF 3544-Order re Michaels, #3 Exhibit ECF 2726-Order re Parisian, #4 Exhibit ECF 6314-Order re Parisian, #5 Exhibit ECF 2047-D M2 Excl Rosenzweig P1, #6 Exhibit ECF 2047-D M2 Excl Rosenzweig P2, #7 Exhibit ECF 2047-D M2 Excl Rosenzweig P3, #8 Exhibit ECF 2668-Order re Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit ECF 2712-Order re Veronikis, #10 Exhibit ECF 2703-Order re Grier, #11 Exhibit ECF 4160-Order re Grier, #12 Exhibit ECF 6247-Order re Grier, #13 Exhibit ECF 2728-Order re Khandwala, #14 Exhibit ECF 2423-P M2 Exclude Khandwala, #15 Exhibit ECF 2430-P M2 Exclude Khandwala Memo, #16 Exhibit ECF 4170-Order re Khandwala, #17 Exhibit ECF 2643-Order re Longacre, #18 Exhibit ECF 2724-Order re MacLean, #19 Exhibit ECF 4183-Order re MacLean, #20 Exhibit ECF 2649-Order re Ulatowski, #21 Exhibit ECF 124-P MIL FDA - Lewis, #22 Exhibit ECF 157-D R2 P MIL FDA - Lewis, #23 Exhibit ECF 167-P Reply MIL FDA - Lewis, #24 Exhibit ECF 196-Order P MIL FDA - Lewis, #25 Exhibit ECF 202-P MIL FDA - Bellew, #26 Exhibit ECF 203-P MIL FDA Memo - Bellew, #27 Exhibit ECF 227-D R2 P MIL FDA - Bellew, #28 Exhibit ECF 287-Order P MIL FDA - Bellew)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 69 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Plfs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Plfs Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs Supplemental Rsp and Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) - Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) - Defs' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 68 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Plfs' Reply to Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Plfs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8496) - Plfs Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8609) - Defs Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 67 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2076) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri A. Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri A. Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Teri A. Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Teri A. Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8495) - Pls' Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8637) - Defs' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Teri A. Longacre)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 66 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2003) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) - Defs' Resp to Plfs' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) - Plfs' Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) - Plfs' Amended Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) - Plfs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2618) - Plfs' Reply to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8494) - Notice of Adoption of Plfs' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8634) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 65 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2022) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2024) - Plfs Memo in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2179) - Defs Memo in Opp to Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2921) - Defs Memo in Opp to Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2982) - Plfs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8488) - Plfs Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8628) - Defs Notice of Adoption to Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 64 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2270) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8535) - Defs' Notice of Adoption of Mot to Exclude Dionysios K. Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8603) - Pls' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Dionysios K. Veronikis)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 63 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Plfs Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 62 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2079) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2080) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2148) - Pls' Mem in Opp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2229) - Defs' Repy to Mem in Opp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3019) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3592) - Def's Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3594) - Defs' Mem in Support of Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3788) - Pls' Mem in Opp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3845) - Defs' Reply in Support of Def's Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8552) - Defs' Notice of Adoption of Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8595) - Pls' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 61 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Paul MichaelsMDL ECF (3663) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8523) - Def's Notice of Adoption of Mot to Excllude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8592) - Pls' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 60 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2128) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2128) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2129) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2202) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2286) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8538) - Defs' Notice of Adoption of Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8583) - Pls' Notice of Adoption of Resp to Mot to Exclude Alan Garely)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 59 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #51 MOTION by Tracy Placido for a Ten-Day Extension of Time in which to File Any Daubert Motion Related to Defense Expert Dr. Teri Longacre. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #52 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #53 Response In Opposition and Objections to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Tracy Placido in opposition to #50 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support by Tracy Placido in opposition to #47 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Aylstock, Bryan) Modified on 8/28/2019 (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM by Tracy Placido in opposition to #49 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Dr. Dionysios K. Veronikis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION by Tracy Placido for a Ten-Day Extension of Time in which to File Any Daubert Motion Related to Defense Expert Dr. Teri Longacre (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION and Memorandum by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Case Specific Opinions of Dr. Dionysios K. Veronikis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #47 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Patty Ann Trantham on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Trantham, Patty) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 45 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #44 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Terri A. Longacre, M.D. on August 13, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. PT (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Terri A. Longacre, M.D. on August 13, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. PT (Baggett, D.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Lance Weaver on TBD at TBD (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #39 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Douglas H. Grier, M.D. on August 12, 2019 at 6:30 p.m. PT. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Rebecca Lee Wiggs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Wiggs, Rebecca) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Douglas H. Grier, M.D. on August 12, 2019 at 6:30 p.m. PT (Baggett, D.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #34 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition by Tracy Placido (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #35 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition by Tracy Placido (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Paul Michaels, M.D. on 7/6/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Dionysios K. Veronikis on August 3, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination of Tracy Placido by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Dr. Faye E. Ameredes on June 13, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracy Placido for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Dr. Kamran P. Sajadi on August 1, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. PT (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel J. Thornburgh on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Thornburgh, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Bobby J. Bradford on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Bradford, Bobby) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by S. Mary Liu on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Liu, S.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Dr. Faye E. Ameredes (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Tracy Placido of Dr. Kamran P. Sajadi (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tracy Placido for Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kenneth Paul Conour on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of David Alan Placido on 05/15/2019 at 1:00 PM (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tracy Placido on 05/15/2019 at 9:00 AM (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kasey Mitchell Adams on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A, the plaintiffs and Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and where named, Ethicon, LLC have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep these cases on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire each of the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A from the active docket, 3) any case listed on Exhibit A that has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018 will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5045. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/15/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Tracy Placido. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Douglass Alan Kreis on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Kreis, Douglass) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by D. Renee Baggett on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Baggett, D.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Bryan F. Aylstock on behalf of Tracy Placido. (Aylstock, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
September 25, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 61 (Scheduling of Discovery Conferences) entered on 08/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]
August 22, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2622463. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Placido v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Rebecca Lee Wiggs
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Conour
Represented By: Jeanne F. Loftis
Represented By: Diane R. Lenkowsky
Represented By: Anita K. Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Rebecca Lee Wiggs
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Conour
Represented By: Jeanne F. Loftis
Represented By: Diane R. Lenkowsky
Represented By: Anita K. Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Placido
Represented By: Bobby J. Bradford
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bowersox
Represented By: D. Renee Baggett
Represented By: Daniel J. Thornburgh
Represented By: Douglass Alan Kreis
Represented By: Patty Ann Trantham
Represented By: S. Mary Liu
Represented By: Bryan F. Aylstock
Represented By: Bobby Jene Bradford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?