Yamasaki v. Sonder Inc
Plaintiff: Sydney S. Yamasaki
Defendant: Sonder Inc, Sonder USA Inc and XYZ Corporations
Case Number: 3:2020cv01911
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint #8 . The Court expects civil cases to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing. Without any basis provided for the extension, the Court finds the parties stipulation for a 90-day extension is excessive at this time. The Court therefore GRANTS a 45-day extension. Defendant Sonder USA, Inc.'s responsive pleading is due 1/25/2021. Further requests for extensions of time will require a scheduling conference with the Court. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint #4 . Filed by Sonder USA Inc, Sonder Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dunn, Loren)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Loren R. Dunn appearing on behalf of Sonder Inc, Sonder USA Inc Filed by on behalf of Sonder Inc, Sonder USA Inc. (Dunn, Loren)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Sonder USA Inc served on 11/20/2020 Filed by Sydney S. Yamasaki. (Thenell, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sonder USA Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Complaint Summons issued as to Sonder USA Inc. Filed by Sydney S. Yamasaki against XYZ Corporations, Sonder USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Thenell, Daniel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sonder Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/5/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7460984 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sydney S. Yamasaki against Sydney S. Yamasaki (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet). (Thenell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamasaki v. Sonder Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonder Inc
Represented By: Loren R. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonder USA Inc
Represented By: David C. Weber
Represented By: Loren R. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney S. Yamasaki
Represented By: Daniel E. Thenell
Represented By: Chelsea P. Pyasetskyy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?