WaterWatch of Oregon et al v. Winchester Water Control District
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources, WaterWatch of Oregon, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations and Steamboaters
Defendant: Winchester Water Control District
Case Number: 3:2020cv01927
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Winchester Water Control District. (Carollo, Dominic)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Dominic M. Carollo appearing on behalf of Winchester Water Control District Filed by on behalf of Winchester Water Control District. (Carollo, Dominic)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Winchester Water Control District waiver sent on 11/16/2020. Filed by WaterWatch of Oregon; Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations; Institute for Fisheries Resources; Steamboaters. (Brimmer, Janette)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Steamboaters, WaterWatch of Oregon. (Brimmer, Janette)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 by attorney Janette K. Brimmer. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Janette K. Brimmer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7479582 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (cw)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Janette K. Brimmer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7479582. Filed by WaterWatch of Oregon, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Steamboaters. (Brimmer, Janette) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/12/2020) (cw).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Winchester Water Control District. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/9/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jn)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Anuta, Karl) Modified on 11/9/2020 to correct event (jn).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7463029 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, WaterWatch of Oregon, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Steamboaters against Winchester Water Control District (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Anuta, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WaterWatch of Oregon et al v. Winchester Water Control District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Water Control District
Represented By: Dominic M. Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Karl G. Anuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WaterWatch of Oregon
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Karl G. Anuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Karl G. Anuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamboaters
Represented By: Janette K. Brimmer
Represented By: Karl G. Anuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?