Johnson v. Garrett et al
Plaintiff: Shon La'Roy Johnson
Defendant: Sgt. Monson, C/O A. Noli, C/O Starr, Diana Jimenez, Sgt. Loke, Pat Garrett and Paul S.F.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01935
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order to Issue Process and Directing Service by the US Marshal. Signed on 1/4/2021 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo.(Mailed order, USM form and summons to Pro Se party on 1/4/2021.) (dsg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Paul S.F. waiver sent on 12/21/2020. Filed by Paul S.F.. (Smith, Vicki)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Loke waiver sent on 11/25/2020; Starr waiver sent on 11/25/2020; Pat Garrett waiver sent on 11/25/2020; A. Noli waiver sent on 11/25/2020; Monson waiver sent on 11/25/2020. Filed by Loke; Starr; Pat Garrett; A. Noli; Monson. (Dickens, Elmer)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #6 ). The court GRANTS plaintiff's Motion for Clarification (ECF No. #6 ) to the extent that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to re-send copies of the court's November 19, 2020, Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) and Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (ECF No. #5 ). Signed on 12/3/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Order #4 , Notice #5 and this Order Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/4/2020.) (joha)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion for Clarification. Filed by Shon La'Roy Johnson. (dsg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 12/21/2020.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/19/2020.)(Mailed notice and complaint to Washington County counsel.) (dsg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Sheriff Pat Garrett or his designee shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 11/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party and Washington County Sheriff on 11/19/2020.) (dsg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/9/2020.) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Shon La'Roy Johnson against Pat Garrett, Diana Jimenez, Loke, Monson, A. Noli, Paul S.F., Starr. (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Shon La'Roy Johnson. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Garrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Monson
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O A. Noli
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Starr
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Loke
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Garrett
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S.F.
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shon La'Roy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?