Bartlett v. First Student, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Bartlett
Defendant: First Student, Inc. and Clarence D. Haws
Case Number: 3:2020cv01954
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Karin J. Immergut to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sss)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (joha)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by First Student, Inc., Clarence D. Haws. (Barton, Robert)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (eo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Filed by First Student, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Ex 1 to Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment Ex 2 to Notice of Removal) (Barton, Robert)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by First Student, Inc.. (Barton, Robert)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV38368 from Multnomah Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7480078 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by First Student, Inc., Clarence D. Haws (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Barton, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. First Student, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bartlett
Represented By: Jason L. Kafoury
Represented By: Mark Gillis McDougal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence D. Haws
Represented By: Robert E Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?