Elixir Therapeutics, LLC v. Global Innovative Concepts, LLC
Plaintiff: Elixir Therapeutics, LLC
Defendant: Global Innovative Concepts, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02055
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (rs)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 1/12/2021. Deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is 3/25/2021. Fact discovery is to be completed by 5/17/2021. Dispositive motions, if any, are due by 6/17/2021. Joint ADR report is waived. ORDER - SETTING a Telephonic Pretrial Conference for Friday, 9/24/2021 at 1:00PM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. FURTHER ORDER - SETTING a three-day Jury Trial for Monday, 10/04/2021 at 09:00AM in Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-9 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration. Cassie Bow present as counsel for plaintiff. John Mark Goodman and Jonathan Stamm present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Jonathan Andrew Stamm appearing on behalf of Global Innovative Concepts, LLC Filed by on behalf of Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. (Stamm, Jonathan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. (Talcott, Anne)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting John Mark Goodman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 for Defendant. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7579122. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John Mark Goodman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7579122. Filed by Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. (Goodman, John Mark)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 1/12/2021 at 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 3, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney John Mark Goodman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7579122 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. Filed by Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. (Talcott, Anne)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/26/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv29344 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7545865. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Global Innovative Concepts, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Talcott, Anne) Modified docket text to add payment information on 11/25/2020 (eo).
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Affirmative Defenses and, Counterclaim Elixir Therapeutics, LLC. Filed by Global Innovative Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Talcott, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elixir Therapeutics, LLC v. Global Innovative Concepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Innovative Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Anne M. Talcott
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Stamm
Represented By: John Mark Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elixir Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?