Saechao Tada v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Daisy Vang Saechao Tada
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv02091
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 12/30/2020, answer due on 4/29/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Service Social Security, #2 Service Attorney General) (ecp)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Papers Received. Summons. Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. (ljp)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 12/3/20 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Daisy Vang Saechao Tada. (Meserow, Nancy)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Daisy Vang Saechao Tada against Andrew Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Meserow, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saechao Tada v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Vang Saechao Tada
Represented By: Nancy J. Meserow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?