Kelley v. Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC
Plaintiff: Charlene Kelley
Defendant: Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02196
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 cl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC. (Bernick, Carol)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC. (Bernick, Carol)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #9 ) for Ori Edelstein. Ordered on 1/25/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ori Edelstein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7822313. Filed by Charlene Kelley. (Edelstein, Ori)
January 25, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ori Edelstein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7822313 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #6 ) for William H. Hogg. Ordered on 1/22/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #5 ) for Carolyn H. Cottrell. Ordered on 1/22/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 22, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell and attorney William M. Hogg. : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney William M. Hogg. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808941. Filed by Charlene Kelley. (Hogg, William)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn H. Cottrell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7808927. Filed by Charlene Kelley. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC served on 1/7/2021 Filed by Charlene Kelley. (Murray, Jennifer)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/20/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Class Action Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7655814 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Charlene Kelley against Charlene Kelley (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Murray, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Kelley
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: William M. Hogg
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willamette Valley Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Carol J. Bernick
Represented By: Cody E. Schvaneveldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?