Martinez-Escobar v. R&R Petroleum, LLC
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez-Escobar
Defendant: R&R Petroleum, LLC doing business as Bob's MLK ARCO
Case Number: 3:2020cv02283
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: As this case is dismissed, the Telephonic Rule 16 Conference which was scheduled for 3/15/2021 at 2:00PM is Stricken. (gm)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, it is Ordered that this action is Dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 1/25/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 3/15/2021 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by R&R Petroleum, LLC. (Stevens, Michael)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/30/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/1/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by R&R Petroleum, LLC. (Rice, TeAnna)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV40332 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7711848 issued.. Filed by R&R Petroleum, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit). (Rice, TeAnna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Escobar v. R&R Petroleum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Petroleum, LLC doing business as Bob's MLK ARCO
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Represented By: TeAnna Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez-Escobar
Represented By: Mark E. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?