Davis v. Adams
Plaintiff: Karley Davis
Defendant: Steve Adams
Case Number: 3:2021cv00013
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7732640. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Frank H. Hall Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Karley Davis. (Wall, Frank)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 2 . Filed by Karley Davis. (Wall, Frank)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/7/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/7/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Karley Davis in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 1/19/2021. (nd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7732723 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Karley Davis against Karley Davis. (Wall, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karley Davis
Represented By: Frank Hamlet Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?