Jamison v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Shawn Jamison
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00039
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended Complaint Amended Complaint for Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefits. Filed by Shawn Jamison against Life Insurance Company of North America, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Cowell, Jesse)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 1/11/2021. Filed by Shawn Jamison. (Cowell, Jesse)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/11/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/10/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sss)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of R. Darrin Class appearing on behalf of Shawn Jamison Filed by on behalf of Shawn Jamison. (Class, R.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance of Christopher E. Roy appearing on behalf of Shawn Jamison Filed by on behalf of Shawn Jamison. (Roy, Christopher)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint for Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefits Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7754043 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Shawn Jamison against Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Cowell, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Jamison
Represented By: Jesse Cowell
Represented By: R. Darrin Class
Represented By: Christopher E. Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?