Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Pension Funds and International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Case Number: 3:2021cv00041
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/12/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/11/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/11/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7754740 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Pension Funds against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Pension Funds
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?