Swanson v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Swanson
Defendant: United States and Joe Biden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00053
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Accordingly, I DISMISS this case with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed on 2/4/2021 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/4/2021.) (kms)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Request for Injunction #2 is DENIED because the request is not supported by sufficient facts that merit an injunction. Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is DENIED as moot because no complaint has been filed. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 1/27/21.) (dls)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/12/2021.) (joha)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Injunction. (No Complaint Filed) Filed by Michael Ray Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (joha)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michael Ray Swanson. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?