Neahkahnie Water District v. Seventeen Enterprises et al
Plaintiff: Neahkahnie Water District
Defendant: Seventeen Enterprises, Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC and Owens Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00108
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises. (Keating, Reilley)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Answer is due by 3/16/2021. (pjg)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises. (Chase, Crystal)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Ciaran Patrick Ahern Connelly appearing on behalf of Neahkahnie Water District Filed by on behalf of Neahkahnie Water District. (Connelly, Ciaran)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 . Answer is due by 3/1/2021. (pjg)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises. (Chase, Crystal)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises Certificate of Service re Notice of Removal Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises. (Chase, Crystal)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/25/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC. (Chase, Crystal)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement Seventeen Enterprises, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Seventeen Enterprises. (Chase, Crystal) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/25/2021) (cw).
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20cv44080 from Circuit Court of the State of Oregon. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7814842 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC, Seventeen Enterprises (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (Chase, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neahkahnie Water District v. Seventeen Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventeen Enterprises
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Reilley D. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacifica Land Conservation, LLC
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Represented By: Reilley D. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neahkahnie Water District
Represented By: Jack L. Orchard, Jr
Represented By: Ciaran Patrick Ahern Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?