Macon v. Proud Ground Organization, et al.
Plaintiff: Jenine K. Macon
Defendant: Proud Ground Organization, Tyler Koski, Yesika Arevalo, Pedro Cruz, Katie Ullrich and Ryan Parker
Case Number: 3:2021cv00109
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate. Filed by All Defendants. (Scholz, Jack)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael H. Simon to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/9/21.) (eo)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Scholz, Jack)
January 31, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Jenine K. Macon. (eo)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Proud Ground Organization. (Anderson, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Jenine K. Macon regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #3 . (sss)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/26/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/25/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal,, #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal,, #1 .) (Anderson, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV32327 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7815899 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Ryan Parker, Tyler Koski, Yesika Arevalo, Katie Ullrich, Proud Ground Organization, Pedro Cruz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet fillable, with dropdown boxes viewable). (Anderson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macon v. Proud Ground Organization, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proud Ground Organization
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Koski
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yesika Arevalo
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Cruz
Represented By: Jack R. Scholz
Represented By: Calliste J. Korach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Ullrich
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Parker
Represented By: David Arden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenine K. Macon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?