Hooks v. Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Petitioner: Regional Director Ronald K. Hooks
Respondent: Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. doing business as KOIN-TV
Case Number: 3:2021cv00177
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit and Representation Statement Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023148. Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INTERIM ORDER FOR RELIEF. ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed on 3/29/2021 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Opinion and Order: Accordingly, I GRANT Petitioner's Petition for Preliminary Injunctive Relief [ECF 1]. Signed on 3/29/2021 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Strike #26 is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
March 25, 2021 Filing 26 Motion to Strike Affidavits Submitted by Petitioner in its Brief in Support of Petition #25 . Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 25 Supplemental Brief in Support of Petition for preliminary injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Supplemental Authorities Regarding Issue of Irreparable Harm Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Plaintiff's Petition for Injunctive Relief #1 is decided in part and taken under advisement in part as stated on the record. Anne P. Pomerantz, Elizabeth DeVleming, Paul A. Thomas and Sarah Kiley Burke present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Charles P. Roberts, III and Kristin L. Bremer present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance of Paul A Thomas appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (Thomas, Paul)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 3/22/2021 at 01:30PM - 02:30PM in Portland by videoconference before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding Petition for Preliminary Injunction [ECF 1]. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
March 12, 2021 Filing 20 Brief Petitioner's Reply to Respondents Response to Petition for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Response to #1 Petition . Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Answer to Petition #1 . Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Related document(s): Petition #1 .) (Bremer, Kristin)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Petition for Injunctive Relief #1 is due by 2/26/21. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 . Attorney Charles P. Roberts, III added. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Charles P. Roberts, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7886801. Filed by Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Leave) (Roberts, Charles)
February 11, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Charles P. Roberts, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7886801 #15 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Kristin L. Bremer appearing on behalf of Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bremer, Kristin)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Sarah Kiley Burke appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (Burke, Sarah)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth DeVleming appearing on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks Filed by on behalf of Ronald K. Hooks. (DeVleming, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kgc)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 Exhibits 7-10 to Memorandum of Points And Authorities. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 10) (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Form of Order Submitted Proposed Order to Show Cause. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Form of Order Submitted Proposed order for Relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Ronald K. Hooks in support of petition for injunctive relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Ronald K. Hooks of Petition for Injunctive Relief Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Petition #1 Petition for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Exhibits to Memorandum of Points and Authorites. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 2) (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibits to Memorandum of Points and Authorites. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 1) (Pomerantz, Anne) (PDF replaced and docket text modified on 2/2/2021 to reflect that this filing is exhibits.) (eo)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support Petition for Injunctive Relief. Filed by Ronald K. Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Pomerantz, Anne)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 Petition Petition for Injunctive Relief (Fee deferral status selected.). Filed by Ronald K. Hooks against Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. doing business as KOIN-TV
Represented By: Charles P Roberts, III
Represented By: Kristin L. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regional Director Ronald K. Hooks
Represented By: Anne P. Pomerantz
Represented By: Sarah Kiley Burke
Represented By: Elizabeth DeVleming
Represented By: Paul A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?