Ambrosetti v. Oregon Catholic Press et al
Plaintiff: Vincent A. Ambrosetti
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press and Bernadette Farrell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00211
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 50 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held on 3/9/2021 by telephone with Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. The Court considers the Motion to Dismiss Duplicative Declaratory Judgment Action (Docket No. 33 in Case No. 3:19-cv-01397) as being filed in this case as of today's date. The Court grants Motion to Lift Stay (Docket No. 35 in 3:19-cv-01397) and sets the following deadlines for both cases: (1) Amended Complaint is to be filed by 3/15/2021. (2) Response to Amended Complaint is to be filed by 4/13/2021. (3) Initial expert reports shall be served by 7/27/2021. (4) A Joint ADR Report is to be filed by 8/6/2021. (5) Rebuttal expert reports are to be served by 8/26/2021. (6) Fact and Expert Discovery are to be completed by 10/5/2021. (7) Dispositive Motions are to be filed by 11/18/2021. Plaintiff has leave to file a Motion to Consolidate, which motion will be considered with the pending Motion to Dismiss. Donald Schmid present as counsel for plaintiff. Leonard DuBoff present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. (pjg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance of Parna A. Mehrbani appearing on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti Filed by on behalf of Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Mehrbani, Parna)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #47 by Attorney Donald J. Schmid. (pjg)
March 5, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Donald J. Schmid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7978797 #47 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
March 5, 2021 Filing 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Donald J. Schmid. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7978797. Filed by Vincent A. Ambrosetti. (Grant, Stephanie)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Telephone Status Conference is SET for Tuesday, March 9, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided to the parties by separate sealed entry. (pjg)
February 24, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael H. Simon to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Scheduling Order - This case will be transferred to Magistrate Judge John Acosta who has an earlier related case pending before him. The Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 before Judge Michael H. Simon is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 10, 2021 Filing 43 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Defendants. (DuBoff, Leonard)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Scheduling Order - Setting a Telephone Conference to discuss the case schedule for Thursday, February 25, 2021 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
February 8, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Northern Indiana (South Bend). Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #39 . (eo)
February 8, 2021 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00371. Electronic file received.
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Transfer DE #9 and ORDERS that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The parties' discovery-related motions DE #29 , DE #30 , DE #31 and DE #33 REMAIN pending for consideration by the Oregon court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/8/21. (nal) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #36 Joint Notice of the Parties re Mediator filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. Parties are provided the following panel of qualified mediators from which to strike: Nancy G. Tinsley, Indianapolis, IN (317) 370-2529; Daniel J. Lueders, Indianapolis, IN 317-634-3456 and John A. Conway, South Bend, IN 574-968-0760. Upon receipt of this order, Plaintiff shall strike no later than 2/26/2021, and Defendants' shall strike no later than 3/8/2021. Following striking, the mediator who remains shall be appointed to mediate the parties dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/26/2021. (mrm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE by Vincent A Ambrosetti [Joint Notice of the Parties re Mediator] (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY to Motion re #33 MOTION to Stay re #31 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from prior to June 30 2018 from defendants Pending Resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer filed by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kinsman, Matthew) Modified docket text on 1/13/2021 (kjp). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Stay re #31 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from prior to June 30 2018 from defendants Pending Resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer [with supplement declaration of Donald J Schmid and Exh A] filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay re #31 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from prior to June 30 2018 from defendants Pending Resolution of Defendants Motion to Transfer by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 37-1 AND FED.R.CIV.P. 37. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from prior to June 30 2018 from defendants by Plaintiff Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Protective Order with proposed Protective Order attached and Cross-Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order with proposed Protective Order attached by Plaintiff Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon Surreply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the District of Oregon filed by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply on or before 11/09/2020. The Sur-reply and exhibit must be filed by separate entry.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/4/20. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File (Renewed and Unopposed) Surreply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the District of Oregon by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/24/2020. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 TELEPHONC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/13/2020. before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Schmid. Dft appeared by atty DuBoff, Kinsman. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 12/11/2020. Discovery deadline is 6/1/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/1/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/3/2021. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/2/2020. Mediator Selection Deadline is 1/15/2021. Mediation to be completed by 5/17/2021. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/3/2020. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 9/28/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/8/20. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press.(Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION for Leave to File. Defendants may file their sur-reply and exhibits, as proposed [DE 15-1, DE 15-2, DE 15-3], if filed on or before 8/13/2020 as outlined in Order. The Court will not strike Plaintiff's supplemental brief, but ADMONISHES Plaintiff and his counsel that future violations of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Rules for the Northern District of Indiana will be not tolerated and could result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/11/2020. (mrm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #16 Defendants' original Motion. With the agreement of the parties, good cause exists to extend Defendants' responsive pleading deadline by fourteen days. Therefore, Defendants' Alternative Motion is GRANTED #18 . The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED until 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/10/2020. (mrm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint and opposing an open-ended extension of time for defendants to answer the complaint that would be tied to the Court's ruling on the pending mtn to transfer venue filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the District of Oregon by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Surreply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the District of Oregon, #2 Exhibit A to Surreply - Declaration of Leonard DuBoff, #3 Exhibit B to Surreply - Finell Biographical Information)(Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon re misleading statements by defendants in their reply brief filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon filed by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon SUPPLEMENT filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Attachments: #1 District of Oregon Court's Order denying OCP mtn to lift stay of declaratory judgment action in Oregon)(Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Donald J. Schmid in support of plaintiff's opposition to motion to transfer venue)(Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Set Deadlines: Answer due 8/7/20 as to Bernadette Farrell and Oregon Catholic Press per #10 Agreed Notice. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press ; answer due by 08/07/2020. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Oregon by Defendants Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bernadette Farrell, #2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Leonard DuBoff)(Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Kinsman on behalf of Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press (Kinsman, Matthew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Hurley on behalf of Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press (Hurley, Ryan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy L Osborn on behalf of Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press (Osborn, Kathy) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Leonard D DuBoff PHV for Bernadette Farrell and Oregon Catholic Press. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/16/2020. With the granting of this Order, the Court reminds Attorney DuBoff of his obligation to notify the Court of any change regarding his status in any bar to which he is admitted. (ace) Modified on 6/17/2020 (ace). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Application for Attorney Leonard D. DuBoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oregon Catholic Press and Bernadette Farrell. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4253956(DuBoff PHV, Leonard) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
May 12, 2020 Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. Judge Robert L Miller, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jat) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
May 11, 2020 AO 121 submitted via email to US Copyright. (jat) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (jat) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bernadette Farrell, Oregon Catholic Press( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4221369.), filed by Vincent A Ambrosetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons OCP, #4 Proposed Summons Farrell, #5 Supplement AO121)(Schmid, Donald) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrosetti v. Oregon Catholic Press et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Catholic Press
Represented By: Kathy L Osborn
Represented By: Leonard D DuBoff PHV
Represented By: Ryan M Hurley
Represented By: Matthew R Kinsman
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Farrell
Represented By: Kathy L Osborn
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Represented By: Ryan M Hurley
Represented By: Matthew R Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent A. Ambrosetti
Represented By: Donald J. Schmid
Represented By: Parna A. Mehrbani
Represented By: Stephanie J. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?