Hache v. Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Trosky Hache
Defendant: Robert Opolka, Jason Cox, Martin Fouts, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Raymond Presley, Jeffrey Fowler, Talgo Corporation, Michaela Merrill and Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00222
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-7882329. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Joan Ellen Brambani Related Doc #7 Request. (nd)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated General Judgment of Dismissal With Prejudice: Granting Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No. #13 ). Signed on 3/12/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/12/2021.) (gw)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Crowhurst, Megan)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Defendant Martin Fouts' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #11 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/18/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/2/2021.) (gw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Response Pleading. Filed by Martin Fouts. (Gibson, Ryan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Ryan S. Gibson appearing on behalf of Martin Fouts and Consent to Removal Filed by on behalf of Martin Fouts. (Gibson, Ryan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Raymond Presley, Jeffrey Fowler, and Robert Opolka's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #8 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/18/2021. Ordered on 2/16/2021 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/17/2021.) (gw)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Response Pleading. Filed by Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Jeffrey Fowler, Robert Opolka, Raymond Presley. (Cooper, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Filed by Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Jason Cox, Jeffrey Fowler, Michaela Merrill, Robert Opolka, Raymond Presley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Crowhurst, Megan)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Trosky Hache regarding Notice of Case Assignment #5 . (joha)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/11/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Jason Cox in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 2/22/2021. (lp)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jason Cox, Jeffrey Fowler, Michaela Merrill, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Robert Opolka, Raymond Presley. (Crowhurst, Megan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Megan Crowhurst In Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Jason Cox, Jeffrey Fowler, Michaela Merrill, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Robert Opolka, Raymond Presley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Crowhurst, Megan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV43128 from Multnomah County Oregon Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7882476 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Raymond Presley, Michaela Merrill, Jason Cox, Jeffrey Fowler, Robert Opolka (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Crowhurst, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hache v. Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Opolka
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cox
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Fouts
Represented By: Ryan S. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Presley
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Fowler
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talgo Corporation
Represented By: Bryan D. Scholnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaela Merrill
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak - National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Megan J. Crowhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trosky Hache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?