Rock v. Airgas USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rock
Defendant: Airgas USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00247
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Airgas USA, LLC. (Underhill, Dayna)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Airgas USA, LLC. (Underhill, Dayna)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/31/2021. Ordered on 3/8/202by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Stipulated Complaint, #1 . Filed by Airgas USA, LLC. (Underhill, Dayna)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Dayna E. Underhill appearing on behalf of Airgas USA, LLC Filed by on behalf of Airgas USA, LLC. (Underhill, Dayna)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Airgas USA, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/16/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/16/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (kgc)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7898220 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nicholas Rock against Airgas USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Mazaheri, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock v. Airgas USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rock
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas USA, LLC
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Represented By: Trisha Thompson
Represented By: Dayna E. Underhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?