Bogushevich v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Igor Bogushevich
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and Timothy Roberts
Case Number: 3:2021cv00313
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Timothy Roberts, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Crow, Jennifer)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/29/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona. Filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Crow, Jennifer)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Jennifer L. Crow iso Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Crow, Jennifer)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV02449 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7952786 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Timothy Roberts, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Crow, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogushevich v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Crow
Represented By: Kailey M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Roberts
Represented By: Jennifer L. Crow
Represented By: Kailey M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Bogushevich
Represented By: Thomas Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?