Ewing v. Snowe, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ewing
Defendant: Snowe, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00325
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, 5/26/2021 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim Benjamin Ewing. Filed by Snowe, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond #10 is granted. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 4/29/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Snowe, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Respond #8 is granted. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 4/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulation For Extension to Respond by Snowe, Inc.. Filed by Snowe, Inc.. (Hafen, Tyson)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Snowe, Inc. served on 3/3/2021 Filed by Benjamin Ewing. (Mauck, Ryan)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Matthew Swanlund's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 for Plaintiff is granted. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7980794. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Swanlund. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7980794. Filed by Benjamin Ewing. (Swanlund, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Matthew Swanlund. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7980794 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to the Register of Copyrights). (rs)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Snowe, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/30/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7965464 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-188-116--Token--Benjamin Ewing, VA 2-213-113--Jaw--Benjamin Ewing, VA 2-187-838--Couple--Benjamin Ewing. Filed by BENJAMIN EWING against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Mauck, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Snowe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ewing
Represented By: Ryan Scott Mauck
Represented By: Matthew Swanlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowe, Inc.
Represented By: Tyson Eugene Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?