Murphy, MD v. Wilhelm
Plaintiff: James Michael Murphy, MD
Defendant: M.D. Thomas J Wilhelm
Case Number: 3:2021cv00349
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated General Judgment of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice as to and against all parties. Signed on 4/21/2021 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/21/2021.) (pjg)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal. Filed by All Defendants. (Young, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Upon further review, the Court is treating Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Notice of Removal #5 as a Motion to Remand. Response is due by 4/29/2021. Reply is due by 5/13/2021. Motion is taken under advisement as of 7/12/2021. The 5/27/2021 Rule 16 Conference is STRICKEN. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/16/2021.) (pjg)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Telephone Rule 16 Conference is SET for Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's conference call information shall be provided to the parties by separate sealed entry. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/16/2021.) (pjg)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by James Michael Murphy, MD. (sss)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #3 Case Reassignment Notice,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/10/2021.) (sss)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/9/2021.) (sss) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/10/2021) (sss).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 7/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/6/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/9/2021.) (sss)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21SC04314 from Hood River Small Claim. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7982521 issued.. Filed by Thomas J Wilhelm (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Young, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy, MD v. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Thomas J Wilhelm
Represented By: Jeffrey Sherwin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Murphy, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?