Teddy v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TEDDY
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00639
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 5/14/2021, answer due on 9/13/2021. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Office of General Counsel, #2 US Attorney General) (sss)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 4/29/2021 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by MICHAEL TEDDY. (Porter, Lisa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by MICHAEL TEDDY against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Porter, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teddy v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TEDDY
Represented By: Lisa R. J. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?