Azin v. McDonough
Plaintiff: Gregg Azin and Gregg Darius Azin
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Case Number: 3:2021cv00705
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Denis McDonough. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corrected Proposed Summons Filed by Gregg Darius Azin. (Paul, David)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kgc)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8072818 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Gregg Azin against Gregg Azin (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Paul, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azin v. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Azin
Represented By: Susan E. Jewell
Represented By: David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Darius Azin
Represented By: Susan E. Jewell
Represented By: David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?