Allstate Indemnity Company v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Reneta Peery, Huong Van Jones, Tamberlee Tarver and Linh Van
Case Number: 3:2021cv00717
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Huong Van Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service) (Mentzer, Adam)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Linh Van. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service) (Rask, Thomas)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Tamberlee Tarver. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Rubino, Ronald)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Huong Van Jones served on 5/29/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Foley, Douglas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Reneta Peery served on 5/21/2021 Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Foley, Douglas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Linh Van served on 5/17/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Foley, Douglas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Tamberlee Tarver served on 5/13/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Foley, Douglas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Huong Van Jones, Reneta Peery, Tamberlee Tarver, Linh Van. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Foley, Douglas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8075847 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons). (Foley, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Douglas F. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reneta Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huong Van Jones
Represented By: Adam Nathaniel Mentzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamberlee Tarver
Represented By: Ronald Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linh Van
Represented By: Thomas R. Rask, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?