Cupryk v. Kroger Dedicated Logistics Company et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Cupryk
Defendant: Kroger Dedicated Logistics Company and Timothy D. Patterson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00736
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Order #6 to Multnomah County Circuit Court. (kgc)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion to Remand #4 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants Unopposed Motion for Remand is GRANTED. 2. This action is remanded to the Circuit Court of the State of Oregon for the County of Multnomah. The Clerk of the Court shall immediately send a certified copy of this remand order to the clerk of the Multnomah County Circuit Court. Signed on 5/25/2021 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (kgc)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Form of Order Submitted Re Order of Remand. Filed by All Defendants. (Kirsher, Robert)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by All Defendants. (Kirsher, Robert)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/10/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/12/2021. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (kgc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Robert W. Kirsher . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Kirsher, Robert)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV14322 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8080794 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Kroger Dedicated Logistics Company, Timothy D. Patterson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kirsher, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cupryk v. Kroger Dedicated Logistics Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Dedicated Logistics Company
Represented By: Robert W. Kirsher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Patterson
Represented By: Robert W. Kirsher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cupryk
Represented By: Judson Wesnousky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?