Young v. Hendrix
Petitioner: Darryl William Young
Respondent: DeWayne Hendrix
Case Number: 3:2021cv00915
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 13898 issued. (et)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Pro se Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Darryl William Young. (dsg)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL: This Court appoints the Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main Street, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, to represent petitioner in this proceeding. The Court notes that the Federal Defender is currently representing petitioner in Case No. 3:20-cv-01177-SB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall submit the $5.00 filing fee or apply to proceed in forma pauperis. The failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 6/29/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/29/2021.) (Petition #1 and this Order emailed to FPD on 6/29/2021.) (jw)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing. Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order #3 sent to AUSA Natalie Wight via interoffice mail. (jw)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 on respondent. Signed on 6/29/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 2241 Petition) (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/29/2021.) (jw)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to pro se party on 6/18/2021.) (dsg)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Darryl William Young against DeWayne Hendrix. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darryl William Young
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DeWayne Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?