Odighizuwa v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Owamagbe Odighizuwa
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01000
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: At defendant's request, the Settlement Conference set for September 28, 2021 is RESET to October 26, 2021 at 9:00AM in Portland by videoconference before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. The Court's videoconference information has been provided to the parties by email. (pjg)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: staying all deadlines, including but not limited to defendant's response to plaintiff's complaint, until 14 days after the conclusion of the settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta: Settlement Conference is SET for Tuesday, September 28, 2021 at 9:00AM in Portland chambers before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. Plaintiff is to arrive at 9:00 AM. Defendant will appear by video and is to sign-on at 9:45 AM. The link to the videoconference has been provided to Defendant. (pjg)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 First Amended Complaint for National Origin Discrimination. Filed by Owamagbe Odighizuwa against Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Fuller, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 7/28/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Laurick, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Laurick, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of John W. Delaney . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Laurick, James)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/4/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/6/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV22992 from Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8147332 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Laurick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odighizuwa v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owamagbe Odighizuwa
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?