Beast Holdings, LLC et al v. Private by Design, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Beast Holdings, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC and GAMECHANGER247, LLC
Defendant: Private by Design, LLC, www.shop-mrbeast.com, Porkbun, LLC, Doe Defendants 1-20 and shop-mrbeasts.com
Case Number: 3:2021cv01119
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 25 Amended Complaint . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, MrBeastYouTube, LLC, GameChanger247, LLC against www.shop-mrbeast.com, shop-mrbeasts.com. (Oates, Daniel)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition #23 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint by 9/16/2021. Denying as Moot Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition #21 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 1, 2021 Filing 23 Corrected Motion to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition, #21 . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GameChanger247, LLC, MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 Errata Corrected Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Errata Corrected Proposed Order, #4 Errata Corrected Decl of Oates) (Oates, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 Declaration of Daniel J. Oates ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GameChanger247, LLC, MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition, #21 .) (Oates, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GameChanger247, LLC, MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Oates, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Per the Parties joint email request, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is WITHDRAWN. Oral Argument set for 8/13/21 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is due 8/6/21. Plaintiffs Reply is due 8/10/21. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 8/13/2021 at 11:00AM - 12:00PM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #12 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Having concluded that MrBeast satisfies the standard for interim injunctive relief, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, the motion is hereby GRANTED, and Porkbun, LLC is hereby ORDERED to suspend Defendants' domain name (i.e., www.shop-mrbeast.com) until such timeas the Court has heard the parties' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed on 8/2/21 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #12 Corrected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect event was used. The following corrections were made to the record: The incorrect event was selected at filing, the event has been changed, docket type and docket text has been corrected. (sss)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (sss)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Porkbun, LLC, Private by Design, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/29/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 12/27/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 Corrected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) (Oates, Daniel) Modified to correct event type on 7/30/2021 . NEF Regenerated.(sss)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 Exhibits to Complaint for Trademark and Copyright Infringement re Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons Porkbun, LLC Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Private by Design, LLC Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Vanessa Wheeler . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration of Sue Parisher . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of Ryan Quinn . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of Rory Mac Burke . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration of Paul Havel . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Nathan Murray . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 .) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Oates, Daniel)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. for Trademark and Copyright Infringement Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8174898 Jury Trial Requested: No, 5,930,575--12/10/2019--MrBeastYouTube, LLC, 88/921,390--5/18/2020--Beast Holdings, LLC, 90/327,242--11/18/2020--Beast Holdings, LLC, 90/493,397--1/27/2021--Beast Holdings, LLC. Filed by Beast Holdings, LLC, MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC, GAMECHANGER247, LLC against Doe Defendants 1-20, Porkbun, LLC, Private by Design, LLC, www.shop-mrbeast.com (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Oates, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beast Holdings, LLC et al v. Private by Design, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beast Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Jesus Miguel Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRBEASTYOUTUBE, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Jesus Miguel Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAMECHANGER247, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Jesus Miguel Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private by Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.shop-mrbeast.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porkbun, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop-mrbeasts.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?