Blackford v. Cura CS, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Blackford
Defendant: Cura CS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01240
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8201756 and AORDC-8201797. The request has been granted and the amount of $804.00 (2@$402.00 each) will be refunded to Graham Sweitzer Related Doc #7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Cura CS, LLC. (Sweitzer, Graham)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Filed by Brian Blackford. (Hoesly, Cody)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Two duplicate payments in the amount of $402.00 each were submitted by Cura CS, LLC in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 8/30/2021. (lp)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/18/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #1 Notice of Removal,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: Filer refiled Notice Of Removal #2 to include attachments. The following corrections were made to the record: The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (ecp)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV25203 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8201797 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cura CS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration Of Graham Sweitzer in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Sweitzer, Graham)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV25203 from Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8201774 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cura CS, LLC. (Sweitzer, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackford v. Cura CS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Blackford
Represented By: Cody B. Hoesly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cura CS, LLC
Represented By: William F. Gary
Represented By: C. Robert Steringer
Represented By: Graham M. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?