Klascius v. Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan
Plaintiff: Craig Klascius
Defendant: Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan
Case Number: 3:2021cv01251
Filed: August 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan waiver sent on 8/24/2021. Filed by Craig Klascius. (Bordelon, Jeremy)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Russell S. Buhite appearing on behalf of Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan. Filed by Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan. (Buhite, Russell)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/21/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/20/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/20/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
August 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8203860 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Craig Klascius against Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bordelon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klascius v. Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Klascius
Represented By: Jeremy L. Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Health Employee Short-Term and Long-Term Income Supplement Plan
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?