OpenSesame, Inc. v. GO1 Pty, Ltd.
Plaintiff: OpenSesame, Inc.
Defendant: GO1 Pty, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01258
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Darin Snyder's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #14 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Patrick Nack-Lehman's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #13 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Carolyn Wall's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #12 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting David Almeling's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #11 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Elizabeth Moulton's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #10 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Bas DE Blank's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #9 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Clement S. Roberts' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #8 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dsg)
October 19, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice entries: #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , and #14 . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Clement S. Roberts. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273008 #8 ; Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bas DE Blank. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273047 #9 ; Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Elizabeth Moulton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273077 #10 ; Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David Almeling. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273687 #11 ; . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn Wall. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273671 #12 ; Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Patrick Nack-Lehman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273730 #13 Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Darin Snyder. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273745 #14 Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (sss)
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Roberts, Clement)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Darin Snyder. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273745. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Snyder, Darin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Patrick Nack-Lehman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273730. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Nack-Lehman, Patrick)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Carolyn Wall. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273671. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Wall, Carolyn)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney David Almeling. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273687. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Almeling, David)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Elizabeth Moulton. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273077. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Moulton, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Bas DE Blank. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273047. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (DE Blank, Bas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Clement S. Roberts. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8273008. Filed by GO1 Pty, Ltd.. (Roberts, Clement)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #5 ) for Willmore F. Holbrow III. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
September 2, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Willmore F. Holbrow, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8215606 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The signature of local counsel was missing. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Willmore F. Holbrow, III. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8215606. Filed by OpenSesame, Inc.. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/1/2021) (cw).
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent.. (ecp)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to GO1 Pty, Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/27/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/24/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/24/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. for Patent Infringement Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8205470 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 8,784,113--7/22/2014--OpenSesame, Inc.. Filed by OpenSesame, Inc. against GO1 Pty, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Larsen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OpenSesame, Inc. v. GO1 Pty, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OpenSesame, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Larsen
Represented By: Willmore F. Holbrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GO1 Pty, Ltd.
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Represented By: Darin Snyder
Represented By: David Almeling
Represented By: Kristin S. Cornuelle
Represented By: Bas DE Blank
Represented By: Carolyn Wall
Represented By: Elizabeth Moulton
Represented By: Patrick Nack-Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?