Hale v. New York City et al
Plaintiff: Brian Hale
Defendant: New York City and New York State
Case Number: 3:2021cv01286
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed IFP #5 . Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, curing deficiencies noted, within 30 days of this Opinion & Order. The Clerk shall not issue a summons without direction from the Court. Signed on 9/29/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/29/2021.) (jp)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brian Hale. (kgc)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (kgc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE: Pursuant to LR 3-4(a), advance payment of all required fees or the filing of an application to proceed in forma pauperis must occur before the Clerks Office can provide any services covered under the Schedule of Fees adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States. Accordingly, you must either pay the appropriate filing fee in this case or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days. Filing Fee must be paid by 9/22/2021. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/1/2021.) (jp)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 08/30/2021.) (kgc)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Brian Hale against New York City, New York State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (No Civil Cover Sheet, No IFP, No Fee Paid) (kgc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2021: #2 Exhibit) (kgc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. New York City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?