Hale v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Brian Hale
Defendant: City of Los Angeles and State of California
Case Number: 3:2021cv01316
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed IFP #3 . Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, curing deficiencies noted above, within 30 days of this Opinion & Order. The Clerk shall not issue a summons without direction from the Court. Signed on 10/12/2021 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/13/2021.) (jp)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (kgc)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Brian Hale. (kgc)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brian Hale. (kgc)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 09/08/2021.) (kgc)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Brian Hale against City of Los Angeles, State of CA. (No Civil Cover Sheet, No IFP, No Fee Paid). (kgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?