Jefferson v. Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: Recarr Jefferson
Defendant: Debra Jefferson, Daniel Jefferson, II and Daniel Jefferson, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01330
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs amended complaint is nearly identical to the first complaint and therefore does not comply with the Courts directive. Because Plaintiff failed to adequately amend the complaint, I DISMISS this case with prejudice. Signed on 10/15/2021 by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/15/2021.) (kms)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Supplement to Amended Complaint #8 . (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). Filed by Recarr Jefferson. (joha)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Courts Order 6 denying Plaintiffs Motion to Seal is VACATED. The Court received the documents proposed to be filed under seal as attachments. The documents and Plaintiffs amended complaint will be docketed. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/14/2021.) (kms)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VACATEDORDER: Motion to Seal #5 is DENIED. The motion does not comply with local rules. Local Rule LR 5-1(e) requires that Motions to file documents under seal must be filed electronically and include the document(s) proposed to be filed under seal as attachments. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/13/21.) (dls) Modified on 10/14/2021 per order 7.(kms).
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Complaint. Filed by Recarr Jefferson against All Defendants. (joha)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Seal. Filed by Recarr Jefferson. (ecp)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiffs Complaint #1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiffs amended complaint is due in thirty days on October 13, 2021. If Plaintiff refiles the complaint, the complaint should contain a short and plain statement of the grounds for the Courts jurisdiction as well as a short and plain statement of the claim showing that Plaintiff is entitled to relief. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/13/2021.) (kms)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/10/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/7/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/7/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/10/2021.) (ecp)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 94821.Summons issued as to Debra Jefferson and Daniel Jefferson II. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Recarr Jefferson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recarr Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jefferson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jefferson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?