Grange v. MVConnect, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Todd Grange
Defendant: MVCONNECT, LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2021cv01385
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #7 is GRANTED. Defendants deadline to answer is continued for 10/28/2021 to 11/29/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by MVCONNECT, LLC. (Clarke, John)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Todd Grange against MVCONNECT, LLC. (Grange, Todd)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by MVCONNECT, LLC. (Clarke, John)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to MVCONNECT, LLC served on 10/7/2021, answer due on 10/28/2021. (Grange, Todd)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/12/2021.) (kms)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Todd Grange. (ecp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MVCONNECT, LLC. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/28/21.) (sb)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 2/18/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/21/21.) (sb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 94982. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Todd Grange against MVCONNECT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange v. MVConnect, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Grange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVCONNECT, LLC
Represented By: Joshua M. Sasaki
Represented By: John Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?