Kaady v. Portland Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Michael Riad Kaddy and Michael Riad Kaady
Defendant: Portland Police Department, Robel Shiferaw, Nichole Jergovil and Dobbs
Case Number: 3:2021cv01400
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #6 . Signed on 11/4/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/4/21.) (gm)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: In light of plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) #6 , the Court withdraws its Findings and Recommendation #4 entered November 2, 2021. A review of plaintiff's IFP application #6 reveals he is unable to pay the costs associated with this action. An order to proceed IFP, along with service instructions, will enter separately. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/4/21.) (gm)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Findings & Recommendation #4 is referred to Judge Michael H. Simon for review. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the court. Thereafter, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/2/21.) (gm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Findings & Recommendation: This action should be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. Signed on 11/2/21 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/2/21.) (gm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michael Riad Kaady. (ecp)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Plaintiff initiated this action on September 21, 2021. However, plaintiff failed to submit the required filing fee or seek in forma pauperis (IFP) status. Plaintiff is directed to submit the required fee or an application for IFP status within 14 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff is warned that a failure to submit the fee or IFP application will result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to provide plaintiff with an IFP application form. (Deposited copy of Order/IFP form in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/12/21.) (gm)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 9/23/2021.) (ecp)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. No fee or IFP received Filed by Michael Riad Kaddy against All Defendants. (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaady v. Portland Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Riad Kaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Riad Kaady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robel Shiferaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Jergovil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?