Western Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, et al.
Plaintiff: Western Resources Legal Center
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv01646
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Danielson, Kevin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon National Marine Fisheries Service served on 11/19/2021; National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 11/19/2021 Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/15/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (kgc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons NOAA Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons NMFS Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Justesen, Tate)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8303780 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Justesen, Tate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Resources Legal Center
Represented By: Aaron E. Bruner
Represented By: Tate F. Justesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?