Fernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Craig A. Fernandez
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, Bank of the Pacific and Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2021cv01663
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bank of the Pacific. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
January 3, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
January 3, 2022 Filing 18 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Killeen, Tyler)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #9 ) for Warren F. Cangany. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 3, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Warren F Cangany. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8352261 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Defendant Bank of the Pacific's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #15 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/24/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 30, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Bank of the Pacific. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Brian T. Kiolbasa appearing on behalf of Bank of the Pacific. Filed by Bank of the Pacific. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #11 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/2/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, #1 . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Warren F Cangany. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8352261. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Cangany, Warren)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Bank of the Pacific served on 12/10/2021, answer due on 1/3/2022; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/13/2021, answer due on 1/3/2022; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/13/2021, answer due on 1/3/2022; TransUnion, LLC served on 12/13/2021, answer due on 1/3/2022. (Schumacher, Kyle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Pilar C. French appearing on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (French, Pilar)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Brian T. Kiolbasa appearing on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. Filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association waiver sent on 11/23/2021. Filed by Craig A. Fernandez. (Schumacher, Kyle)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of the Pacific, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/17/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/18/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 4/18/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8309881 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Craig A. Fernandez against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A. Fernandez
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Warren F Cangany
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the Pacific
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?