W. et al v. Providence Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Chris W. and Ms. Jennifer W.
Defendant: Providence Health Plan, Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross, Providence Health & Services doing business as Providence, Intel Corporation and Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan
Case Number: 3:2022cv00428
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Granting Nancy B. Pridgen's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #66 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
April 22, 2022 Filing 66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nancy B. Pridgen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8491546. Filed by Blue Cross of California, Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Pridgen, Nancy)
April 22, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nancy B. Pridgen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8491546 #66 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 21, 2022 Filing 65 Notice of Appearance of Mark A. Crabtree appearing on behalf of Blue Cross of California, Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan. Filed by Blue Cross of California, Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan. (Crabtree, Mark)
March 16, 2022 Filing 64 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo) (CAND Counsel notified by e-mail.)
March 16, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of California Northern. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon or are only admitted pro hac vice. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #62 . (eo)
March 16, 2022 Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-04491. Electronic file received.
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/15/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DISTRICT OF OREGON, PORTLAND DIVISION filed by Chris W., Jennifer W., Intel Corporation, The Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan; and Blue Cross of California. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 2/18/2022) Modified on 2/22/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Designation of Experts due by 4/22/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/20/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/13/2021. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 58 STIPULATION To Amend Scheduling Order filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan, Chris W. and Jennifer W. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 11/19/2021) Modified on 11/22/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/10/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nancy Pridgen. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15461604.) filed by Intel Corporation, Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 1/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jenna Uyen Nguyen Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross (Nguyen, Jenna) (Filed on 1/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Chad R. Fuller Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 1/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. #45 , is suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The motion hearing on January 14, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/12/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY (re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion ) filed byProvidence Health & Services, Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #49 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Bl ue Cross of California. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion ) filed byChris W., Jennifer W.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Lilienstein, #2 Exhibit 1 to Lilienstein Declaration)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 12/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint by Intel Corporation, the Intel Plan, and byBlue Cross of California. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 48 Declaration of J. Dino Vasquez in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 47 Declaration of Aaron Bals in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 46 Declaration of John Whipple in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) and Alternative 12(E) Motion filed by Providence Health Plan. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/22/2020. Replies due by 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #43 , defendants may respond to the amended complaint by December 22, 2020. No further extensions of this deadline are likely to be granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #39 Amended Complaint filed by Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 12/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/23/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 11/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Selection set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/5/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byChris W., Jennifer W.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 10/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy Chu (Chu, Tammy) (Filed on 10/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE PERSONAL JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/7/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The hearing set for October 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., will be for the initial case management conference only. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. #19 , is suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The initial case management conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by October 7, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chris W., Jennifer W.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 10/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The parties are reminded that they may not unilaterally change case management dates. See Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Judge James Donato. The case management conference and motion hearing will proceed as ordered. The case management statement is due by October 5, 2020, at 5 p.m. California time. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Aaron Bals in Support of #30 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Providence Health Plan (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byChris W., Jennifer W.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katie Spielman)(Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Uyen Nguyen (Nguyen, Jenna) (Filed on 9/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/4/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Blue Cross of California. (Fuller, Chad) (Filed on 9/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Aaron Bals in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/31/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 Declaration of J. Dino Vasquez in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byProvidence Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/31/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Providence Health Plan. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/31/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/27/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION and [PROPOSED] Order for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/21/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/21/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/20/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Providence Health Plan.. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Providence Health shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Providence Health Plan identifying Corporate Parent Providence St. Joseph Health, Corporate Parent Providence Health & Services, Corporate Parent Providence Health & Services - Oregon for Providence Health Plan. (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Dino Vasquez (Vasquez, Jose) (Filed on 8/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chris W., Jennifer W. Service waived by Blue Cross of California waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 7/30/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris W., Jennifer W... (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross of California, Providence Health Plan. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 7/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/22/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Chris W., Jennifer W. . (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Anthem Blue Cross should be entered in the 'alias' field and not as part of defendant's name. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Jennifer W., Chris W. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #3 *** Civil Cover Sheet by Chris W., Jennifer W. . (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 7/7/2020) Modified on 7/8/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14663659.). Filed byChris W., Jennifer W.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 7/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/16/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. Providence Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Chris W.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jennifer W.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health Plan
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Represented By: Tammy Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services doing business as Providence
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation Anthem HDHP Plan
Represented By: Donald Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Nancy B. Pridgen
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?