Bailey v. Multnomah County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Edward Bailey
Defendant: Multnomah County Sheriff, Michael Reese, CPT. Eric P. Smith, Bob Burton, Jane-Doe #2, Jane-Doe #11, Jane-Doe Medical #8, Jane-Doe Medical #10, Jane-Doe Medical #11, John-Doe #1, John-Doe #2, John-Doe #3, John-Doe #4, John-Doe #5, John-Doe #6, John-Doe #7, John-Doe #8, John-Doe #9, John-Doe #10, John-Doe Medical #8, John-Doe Medical #10, John-Doe Medical #11, Sgt. John-Doe #3, Sgt. John-doe #4, STG. John-Doe #3 and STG. John-Doe #4
Case Number: 3:2022cv00429
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Michael Reese served on 4/26/2022, answer due on 5/17/2022. (dino)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Magistrate Judge #11 is denied. Standing Order 07-MC-9207 provides that "all civil... matters which the law authorizes to be performed by a Magistrate Judge are referred to the Magistrate Judges of this District for appropriate disposition...." See also 28 U.S.C. 636; LR 72-1. Therefore, as allowed by law, a magistrate judge will resolve non-dispositive matters through an order and dispositive matters through findings and recommendations that will be referred to a district judge. See 28 U.S. 636(b)(1)(C); Fed. R. Civ. P. 59. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/29/2022.) (ps1)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Recuse. Titled, "Motion to Dismiss Magistrate." (dino) Modified on 4/29/2022 to correct event and docket text (dsg).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Video to be Allowed and Medical Records Billing on Thumdrive #8 is denied with leave to renew. There is no pending motion that such evidence would pertain to. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #7 is also denied. A plaintiff in a civil case has no right to court-appointed counsel. The court may appoint counsel in exceptional circumstances. However, no such circumstances exist here. Plaintiff has filed a detailed 31-page complaint alleging three claims for relief. There is no indication that plaintiff cannot articulate the relief he seeks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/5/2022.) (pvh)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 This filing includes a conventionally filed USB flash drive. This conventional filing is maintained in the Clerk's Office but cannot be made a part of the court's electronic record in CM/ECF. Exhibit re Motion #8 . Filed by Edward Bailey. (dino)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion (Titled: Motion for Video to be Allowed and Medical Records Billings on Thumbdrive). Filed by Edward Bailey. (dino)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by Edward Bailey. (dino)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Edward Bailey. (dino)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/21/2022.) (pvh)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/18/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/18/2022.) (dino)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued. (dino)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Edward Bailey. (dino)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 97272. Summons issued as to defendant(s). Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Edward Bailey against Multnomah County Sheriff, Michael Reese. (dino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Multnomah County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. Eric P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane-Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane-Doe #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane-Doe Medical #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane-Doe Medical #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane-Doe Medical #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe Medical #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe Medical #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John-Doe Medical #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John-Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. John-doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STG. John-Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STG. John-Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?