Shimomura v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Tsutomu Shimomura
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00455
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, June 21, 2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone. (Conference call information to follow by separate sealed entry.) Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on June 20, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 5/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / Respond to Complaint, #1 . Filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 3/25/2022 Filed by Tsutomu Shimomura. (Glor, Megan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/21/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/22/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 8/22/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8454992 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Tsutomu Shimomura against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Glor, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shimomura v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsutomu Shimomura
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Jere Tolton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?