Li et al v. Global Trade Enterprises, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Hongjiang Li, Shouwen Fu, Chen Li and Jiyou Cao
Defendant: Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Duck House Chinese Restaurant, Haidong Liu, a/k/a John Liu, Sam Doe, David Doe, Sammy Woo, Haidong Liu, Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Duck House Chinese Restaurant and John Liu
Case Number: 3:2022cv00720
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #16 ) for Ge Qu. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
June 14, 2022 Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ge Qu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8551605. Filed by Jiyou Cao, Shouwen Fu, Chen Li, Hongjiang Li. (Qu, Ge)
June 14, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ge Qu. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8551605 #16 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Global Trade Enterprises, Inc.. (Stutheit, Peter)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Sam Doe, Global Trade Enterprises, Inc., David Doe, Haidong Liu. (Stutheit, Peter)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #12 ) for Jian Hang. Ordered on 5/26/2022 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 26, 2022 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jian Jang. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8530643 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 25, 2022 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jian Hang. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8530643. Filed by Jiyou Cao, Shouwen Fu, Chen Li, Hongjiang Li. (Hang, Jian) Modified on 5/26/2022 to correct name of counsel requesting Pro Hac Vice admission(ecp).
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/23/2022 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Sammy Woo served on 5/23/2022 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Haidong Liu served on 5/23/2022 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Global Trade Enterprises, Inc., Haidong Liu, Sammy Woo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Issues summons Liu, #2 Issued summons Woo) (ecp)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Sammy Woo Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons David Doe Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Sam Doe Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Haidong Liu Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Global Trade Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Erickson, Aurelia)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/14/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/14/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8519390 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Shouwen Fu, Jiyou Cao, Hongjiang Li, Chen Li against David Doe, Sam Doe, Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Duck House Chinese Restaurant, Haidong Liu, a/k/a John Liu, Sammy Woo (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Erickson, Aurelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li et al v. Global Trade Enterprises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongjiang Li
Represented By: Aurelia J. Erickson
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peddie
Represented By: Jian Hang
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shouwen Fu
Represented By: Aurelia J. Erickson
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peddie
Represented By: Jian Hang
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chen Li
Represented By: Aurelia J. Erickson
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peddie
Represented By: Jian Hang
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiyou Cao
Represented By: Aurelia J. Erickson
Represented By: Kelsey M. Peddie
Represented By: Jian Hang
Represented By: Ge Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Duck House Chinese Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haidong Liu, a/k/a John Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Doe
Represented By: Maria Witt
Represented By: Peter D. Stutheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Doe
Represented By: Maria Witt
Represented By: Peter D. Stutheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haidong Liu
Represented By: Maria Witt
Represented By: Peter D. Stutheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Trade Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Duck House Chinese Restaurant
Represented By: Maria Witt
Represented By: Peter D. Stutheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liu
Represented By: Maria Witt
Represented By: Peter D. Stutheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?