Dahl v. H B T, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelsea Dahl and Kelsea Hutchins
Defendant: HBT, Inc., Kawaljit Singh Bajwa and H B T, Inc. individually and doing business as H B Transportation doing business as HB Transportation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00808
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by H B T, Inc.. (Hopkins, Caroline)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/3/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/31/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 10/31/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dino)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV28833 from Multnomah County Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8538410 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Kawaljit Singh Bajwa, HBT, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Declaration). (Hopkins, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahl v. H B T, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsea Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsea Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBT, Inc.
Represented By: Graham B. Miller
Represented By: Caroline A. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawaljit Singh Bajwa
Represented By: Graham B. Miller
Represented By: Caroline A. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H B T, Inc. individually and doing business as H B Transportation doing business as HB Transportation
Represented By: Caroline A. Hopkins
Represented By: Graham B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?