Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. On1, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Defendant: On1, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01212
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent.. (kms)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Melissa Aubin. (kms)
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. Filed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. (Spani, Conner)
September 22, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Urrutia, Garrett)
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim On1, Inc.. Filed by On1, Inc.. (Urrutia, Garrett)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to On1, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. (Spani, Conner)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent.. (ecp)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/15/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/17/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 1/17/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. (Spani, Conner)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8623089 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 8,437,797--5/7/2013--Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. Filed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC against On1, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Spani, Conner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. On1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Represented By: Conner Spani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On1, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Reynolds
Represented By: Garrett T. Urrutia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?