Drobot v. Growth Commercial Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory G. Drobot
Defendant: Growth Commercial Capital, Inc. and Ben Looney
Case Number: 3:2022cv01481
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORRECTED ORDER: Taking Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Join Necessary Party (ECF No. #4 ) under advisement as of 11/17/2022. The Court has determined that the motion is suitable for resolution without oral argument. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE BY THE CLERK: Currently there is no consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in this case. If any party would like to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the consent form may be found attached to this docket entry or on the court's website at #ord.uscourts.gov/civil-forms. It may be filed electronically by using the Consent event under Other Filings/Consent in the Civil menu or delivered to the Clerk's Office by mail or in person. For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see #ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/12/2022. (gw)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Taking Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Join Necessary Party (ECF No. #4 ) as of 11/17/2022. The Court has determined that the motion is suitable for resolution without oral argument. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 Supplemental Declaration of Ben Looney in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2) (DiCicco, Daniel)
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Join Necessary Party #4 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (DiCicco, Daniel)
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Gregory G. Drobot in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Gregory G. Drobot. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #9 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Price, Kristen)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Join Necessary Party #4 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Gregory G. Drobot. (Price, Kristen)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #7 Supplemental Exhibit. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The filing was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 Supplement Exhibit to Declaration of Ben Looney. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Declaration #5 .) (DiCicco, Daniel) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/2/2022) (eo).
October 20, 2022 Filing 6 Declaration of Daniel DiCicco in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7) (DiCicco, Daniel)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 Declaration of Ben Looney in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #4 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2) (DiCicco, Daniel)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Join Necessary Party. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (DiCicco, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons) (ecp)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/31/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/2/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 3/2/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8674543 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Gregory G. Drobot against Growth Commercial Capital, Inc., Ben Looney (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Price, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drobot v. Growth Commercial Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory G. Drobot
Represented By: Bruce H. Cahn
Represented By: Kristen Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growth Commercial Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Looney
Represented By: Daniel DiCicco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?